This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 20:10:10 (UTC).

Luella H Dimond vs. Kandi Garza

Case Summary

On 07/31/2015 Luella H Dimond filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kandi Garza. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************6908

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dimond, Luella H

Defendant

Garza, Kandi

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

07/31/2015: Payment Receipt

V3 Document Cover Page

07/31/2015: V3 Document Cover Page

Notice that you have been sued

07/31/2015: Notice that you have been sued

V3 Document Cover Page

07/31/2015: V3 Document Cover Page

V3 Document Cover Page

07/31/2015: V3 Document Cover Page

Payment Receipt

08/06/2015: Payment Receipt

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

08/20/2015: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

09/01/2015: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

09/08/2015: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

09/15/2015: Payment Receipt

Writ Return

Writ of Possession returned Satisfied Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

See file for Documents filed prior to 10/15/15.

11/04/2015: See file for Documents filed prior to 10/15/15.

see file

See file for Documents filed prior to 10/15/15. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession returned Satisfied Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSee file for Documents filed prior to 10/15/15. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2015
  • DocketCase security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketPayment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 09/15/2015, transaction number 1559644 and receipt number 412983. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketComplaint associated on 09/15/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketWrit issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Dimond, Luella H on 09/15/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 45 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketAutomatic UD Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketV3 Document Cover Page generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketV3 Document Cover Page generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketV3 Document Cover Page generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Dimond, Luella H on 07/31/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dimond, Luella H on 07/31/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketComplaint filed by Dimond, Luella H on 07/31/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less