This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:44:30 (UTC).

Lucir Schlickmann vs Josefina Zuniga

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Lucir Schlickmann filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Josefina Zuniga. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1877

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Schlickmann, Lucir

Defendant

Zuniga, Josefina

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Josefina Zuniga served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Josefina Zuniga served on 03/09/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Josefina Zuniga Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Schlickmann, Lucir. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Schlickmann, Lucir. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schlickmann, Lucir. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Lucir Schlickmann against Josefina Zuniga filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Josefina Zuniga served on 03/09/2016 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Josefina Zuniga on 03/02/2016 to . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 36580. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Lucir Schlickmann against Josefina Zuniga filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Schlickmann, Lucir. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Josefina Zuniga Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Josefina Zuniga served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Schlickmann, Lucir. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Schlickmann, Lucir. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 34246. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Schlickmann, Lucir. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less