This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 08:04:52 (UTC).

Lori Garrison vs Valley Caps

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Lori Garrison filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Valley Caps. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2111

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Garrison, Lori

Defendant

Valley Caps

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hedberg, Kenneth R

Defendant Attorney

La Force, Norman

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Lori Garrison, Valley Caps Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 03/15/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Unconditional; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/26/2016 03:37 PM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Manteca CAPS Corporation sued as Valley Caps. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Answer filed by Valley Caps. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Valley Caps served on 04/22/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Lori Garrison, Valley Caps Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 03/15/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Unconditional filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Unconditional; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/20/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on December 20, 2016. Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2016
  • Attorney, Norman La Force, retained for Valley Caps . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Valley Caps served on 04/22/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/26/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 36184. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Garrison, Lori. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Kenneth R Hedberg, retained for Lori Garrison . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less