This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 07:57:57 (UTC).

Lois Thomas vs. Elizabeth Anderson

Case Summary

On 10/24/2011 Lois Thomas filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Elizabeth Anderson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4646

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas, Lois

Defendant

Anderson, Elizabeth

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

10/24/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice that you have been sued

10/24/2011: Notice that you have been sued

UD100 Complaint

10/24/2011: UD100 Complaint

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2011: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

10/24/2011: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Notice That You've Been Sued

10/25/2011: Notice That You've Been Sued

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

11/01/2011: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

MC030 Declaration

11/01/2011: MC030 Declaration

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

11/01/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Payment Receipt

11/03/2011: Payment Receipt

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

11/03/2011: UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

EJ130 Writ of Execution

11/03/2011: EJ130 Writ of Execution

EJ130 Writ of Execution

11/18/2011: EJ130 Writ of Execution

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2012
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Complaint associated on 01/09/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • Writ of Possession Returned filed by Thomas, Lois on 11/18/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • Case security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • Complaint (regarding daily rental value) associated on 11/03/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • Complaint associated on 11/03/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2011
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2011
  • Address for Ronald Leachman selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Payment received for 171 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K (UD) in the amount of 240.00 on 10/24/2011, transaction number 883536 and receipt number 235774. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 10/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Thomas, Lois on 10/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thomas, Lois on 10/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2011
  • Complaint filed by Thomas, Lois on 10/24/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less