This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:37:19 (UTC).

Lockeford Land Group LLC vs Dora F Grijalva

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Lockeford Land Group LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Dora F Grijalva. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1803

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lockeford Land Group LLC

Defendants

Grijalvo, Dora Jesse

Grijalva, Dora F

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 08/17/2016 08:37 AM . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Lockeford Land Group LLC. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order

Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Lockeford Land Group LLC. Defendant's name change to Dora F Grijalva. Action Type: Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 08/17/2016 08:37 AM . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 08/17/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Lockeford Land Group LLC. Defendant's name change to Dora F Grijalva. Action Type: Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $5000.00 Costs $75.00, set for 07/20/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $5000.00 Costs $75.00, set for 05/18/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/23/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Lockeford Land Group LLC. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 33669. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less