This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/22/2020 at 06:13:09 (UTC).

Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991 et al. vs Michael G. Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael G Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2252

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Corder, Rian

Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991

Eidbo, Janet

Defendant

Michael G. Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dyer, Dustin J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Corder, Rian; Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991; Eidbo, Janet. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael G. Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017 served on 09/25/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Corder, Rian; Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991; Eidbo, Janet. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Michael G. Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Answer

Answer and Affirmative Defenses; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Michael G. Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991; Eidbo, Janet; Corder, Rian. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Michael G. Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991; Eidbo, Janet; Corder, Rian. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer and Affirmative Defenses; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Michael G. Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketPayment received by individually Michael G. Corder in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 490142. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Michael G. Corder, individually and as trustee of The Corder Family Trust, Dated February 8, 2017 served on 09/25/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/16/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Corder, Rian; Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991; Eidbo, Janet. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Corder, Rian; Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991; Eidbo, Janet. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by 1991 Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17 in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 473952. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Dustin J Dyer, retained for Rian Corder . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Dustin J Dyer, retained for Janet Eidbo . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Dustin J Dyer, retained for Lisa Villareal individually and as trustee of The Robert and Iva Corder Family Living Trust Dated June 17, 1991 . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.