This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 06:29:29 (UTC).

Lidia Carbajal et al. vs Imperial Maintenance Services, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2016 Lidia Carbajal filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Imperial Maintenance Services, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1100

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sanchez, Ana Maria

Carbajal, Lidia

Beltran, Guadalupe

Defendants

Imperial Maintenance Services, Inc.

Lopez, Marc

Solis, Irma

Perez, Maria

Solis, Alfonso

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martinez, Hector Rodriguez

Defendant Attorney

Parker, Alden J

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of plaintiffs motion to compel defendant imperial maintenance services, inc. to produce documents/data responsive to plaintiffs' request for production of documents set one filed by Sanchez, Ana Maria; Carbajal, Lidia; Beltran, Guadalupe. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 09/12/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

DEFT Imperial Maintenance Services, Inc's Amended answer

DEFT Imperial Maintenance Services, Inc's Amended answer and affirmative defenses to PLTF's first amended complaint filed by Imperial Maintenance Services, Inc.. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

DEFT Alfonso Solis's Amended answer

DEFT Alfonso Solis's Amended answer and affirmative defenses to PLTF's first amended complaint filed by Solis, Alfonso. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/12/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Lopez, Marc. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Carbajal, Lidia; Beltran, Guadalupe. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Alfonso Solis served on 04/11/2016. Type of Service Personal. $54.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Motion & Motion to Compel Defendant Imperial Maintenace services, Inc. to produce documents.data responsive to plaintiffs' request for production of documents set one

Notice of Motion & Motion to Compel Defendant Imperial Maintenace services, Inc. to produce documents.data responsive to plaintiffs' request for production of documents set one filed by Sanchez, Ana Maria; Carbajal, Lidia; Beltran, Guadalupe. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

DEFT Maria Perez's Amended answer

11/15/2016: DEFT Maria Perez's Amended answer

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EH)

Elizabeth Humphreys Assigned. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Imperial Maintenance Services, Inc.. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Perez, Maria. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Carbajal, Lidia. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Irma Solis served on 04/12/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $44.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Marc Lopez served on 04/12/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $44.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Imperial Maintenance Services, Inc. served on 04/11/2016. Type of Service Personal. $44.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Motion to produce documents/data, set for 08/08/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Payment received by Guadalupe Beltran in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 309894. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Separate Statement in support of motion to compel defendant imperial maintenance services, inc. to produce documents/data responsive to plaintiffs request for production of documents filed by Sanchez, Ana Maria; Carbajal, Lidia; Beltran, Guadalupe. Action Type: Separate Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of plaintiffs motion to compel defendant imperial maintenance services, inc. to produce documents/data responsive to plaintiffs' request for production of documents set one filed by Sanchez, Ana Maria; Carbajal, Lidia; Beltran, Guadalupe. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Joseph D. Sutton in support of plaintiffs motion to compel further responses to request for production of documents/data set one filed by Sanchez, Ana Maria; Carbajal, Lidia; Beltran, Guadalupe. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion & Motion to Compel Defendant Imperial Maintenace services, Inc. to produce documents.data responsive to plaintiffs' request for production of documents set one filed by Sanchez, Ana Maria; Carbajal, Lidia; Beltran, Guadalupe. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference and CMC, set for 11/02/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Hearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on September 12, 2017. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 09/12/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 09/12/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/01/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Attorney, Hector Rodriguez Martinez, retained for Guadalupe Beltran . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Attorney, Hector Rodriguez Martinez, retained for Ana Maria Sanchez . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 28592 plus receipt number 28627 received from Lidia Carbajal. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Beltran, Guadalupe; Carbajal, Lidia; Sanchez, Ana Maria. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Beltran, Guadalupe; Carbajal, Lidia; Sanchez, Ana Maria. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Attorney, Hector Rodriguez Martinez, retained for Lidia Carbajal . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less