This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 09:38:50 (UTC).

Legal Recovery Service vs. Hillman

Case Summary

On 11/16/2011 Legal Recovery Service filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Hillman. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************5675

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Legal Recovery Service

Food 4 Less Loss Prevention Department

Defendant

Williams, Kevin W.

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

11/16/2011: Payment Receipt

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

11/16/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

11/16/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/16/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

SC109 Authorization to Appear

11/16/2011: SC109 Authorization to Appear

Proof of Service

12/30/2011: Proof of Service

Minute Order

01/17/2012: Minute Order

SC109 Authorization to Appear

01/17/2012: SC109 Authorization to Appear

Mediated Settlement Ageement

01/17/2012: Mediated Settlement Ageement

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

01/17/2012: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

01/18/2012: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2014
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 95 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 75 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court (as to Quintin Williams) associated on 01/18/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) (as to Quintin Williams) filed by Food 4 Less Loss Prevention Department on 01/17/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • DocketDraft version of minutes printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketAddress for Kevin Williams selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 03 - Claim $1,500 or less in the amount of 30.00 on 11/16/2011, transaction number 895774 and receipt number 238847. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 11/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Food 4 Less Loss Prevention Department on 11/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketSan Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketSC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - 500.00 principal, plus 30.00 costs scheduled for 01/17/2012 at 01:30:00 PM in 17 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 17. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2011
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Legal Recovery Service; Food 4 Less Loss Prevention Department on 11/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant