This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 09:16:52 (UTC).

Lee Marchand vs Fireplace Products U.S. Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Lee Marchand filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Fireplace Products U S Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1849

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marchand, Lee

Defendants

Fireplace Products U.S. Inc.

F P I Fireplace Products Int. LTD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC109 Authorization to Appear

Authorization to Appear filed by Fireplace Products U.S. Inc.. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Vacate held on 06/13/2016 08:46 AM . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 06/13/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC152 Order on Request to Postpone Trial

Order on Request to Postpone Trial Granted. See order filed herein. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC150 Request to Postpone Trial

Request to Postpone Trial (if defendant has been served) filed by Fireplace Products U.S. Inc.. Action Type: Request to Postpone Trial (if defendant has been served); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC135 Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration (Small Claims)

Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration filed by F P I Fireplace Products Int. LTD. Action Type: Notice of Motion to Vacate Judgment and Declaration; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Declaration Re: Notice of Ex-Parte Application

Declaration filed by F P I Fireplace Products Int. LTD. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Motion , set for 05/25/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Marchand, Lee. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/30/2016 08:15 AM . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service as to F P I Fireplace Products Int. LTD (Certified Mail) on 2/26/2016. Melissa Vang signed for mailing. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service as to Fireplace Products U.S. Inc. (Certified Mail). Melissa Vang signed for mailing on 2/26/2016. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Marchand, Lee. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Request for Certified Mail (Small Claims)

Request for Certified Mail filed by Marchand, Lee as to FPI Fireplace Products Int. LTD Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by Marchand, Lee as to Fireplace Products U.S. Inc. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear filed by Fireplace Products U.S. Inc.. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion to Vacate held on 06/13/2016 08:46 AM . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketHearing re: Motion to Vacate held on June 13, 2016. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion to Vacate , set for 06/13/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Trial Granted. See order filed herein. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 06/13/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (if defendant has been served) filed by Fireplace Products U.S. Inc.. Action Type: Request to Postpone Trial (if defendant has been served); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/30/2016 08:15 AM . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service as to Fireplace Products U.S. Inc. (Certified Mail). Melissa Vang signed for mailing on 2/26/2016. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service as to F P I Fireplace Products Int. LTD (Certified Mail) on 2/26/2016. Melissa Vang signed for mailing. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principal $4200.00 Cost $80.00, set for 03/30/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Phillip Urie in Department L2. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Certified Mail filed by Marchand, Lee as to Fireplace Products U.S. Inc. Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $80.00. Receipt number 34069. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Certified Mail filed by Marchand, Lee as to FPI Fireplace Products Int. LTD Action Type: Request for Certified Mail; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Marchand, Lee. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $80.00. Receipt number 34069. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less