This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/21/2018 at 01:43:05 (UTC).

Leanna Scott vs Steve Sartain et al.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 Leanna Scott filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Steve Sartain. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0537

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott, Leanna

Defendants

Sartain, Luchelle

Sartain, Steve

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Scott, Leanna. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Scott, Leanna. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Scott, Leanna. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Scott, Leanna. INVALID, proof not signed by server. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Steve Sartain served on 11/17/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $ 50.00. With attached declaration of diligence. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Luchelle Sartain served on 11/17/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $ 50.00. With attached declaration of diligence. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by Scott, Leanna. NOT entered. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice to Filing Party

12/08/2015: Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV010 Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Civil

Request for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by Scott, Leanna. Entered Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Scott, Leanna. Service date 11/17/15, fees $50.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Leanna Scott against Steve Sartain, Luchelle Sartain filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Leanna Scott against Steve Sartain, Luchelle Sartain filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service as to all occupants filed by Scott, Leanna. Service date 11/17/15, fees $50.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by Scott, Leanna. Entered Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Filing Party. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketRequest for Default against Steve Sartain, Luchelle Sartain Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Scott, Leanna. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default as to all occupants - Civil filed by Scott, Leanna. NOT entered. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service as to all occupants filed by Scott, Leanna. INVALID, proof not signed by server. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Steve Sartain served on 11/17/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $ 50.00. With attached declaration of diligence. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Luchelle Sartain served on 11/17/2015. Type of Service Substituted service. $ 50.00. With attached declaration of diligence. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 6733. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Scott, Leanna. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Scott, Leanna. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Leanna Scott . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowe, Anthony Drew