This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/31/2022 at 06:53:37 (UTC).

Leah Bala Caras et al. vs Henry Armagnac et al.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Leah Bala Caras filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Henry Armagnac. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9909

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caras, Leah Bala

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Arcelo, Remigio

Armagnac, Gary

Armagnac, Henry

Blanco, Mike

Central California Leasing and Equipment, Inc.

Espinoza Diaz, Lucina

Haynes, Andre Lashawn

Diaz, Lucina Espinoza

Arcelo, Remiglo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bohm, Lawrance A.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Jedding, Thomas C.

Leonard, Susan F

Kronlund, Michael C

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer to Cross-Complaint of Defendant Lucina Espinoza Diaz filed by Central California Leasing and Equipment, Inc.; Central California Leasing and Equipment, Inc.; Central California Leasing And Equipment, Inc..

POS010 Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Lucina Espinoza Diaz served on 11/15/2021 by Personal Service. $135.00.

POS010 Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Andre Lashawn Haynes served on 11/09/2021 by Personal Service. $45.00.

POS010 Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Remigio Arcelo served on 10/26/2021 by Personal Service. $50.00.

POS010 Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Mike Blanco served on 10/26/2021 by Personal Service. $50.00.

POS010 Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Gary Armagnac served on 10/28/2021 by Personal Service. $100.00.

POS010 Proof Of Service Of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Central California Leasing and Equipment, Inc. served on 10/26/2021 by Substituted Service. $60.00.

SUM110 Summons - Cross Complaint

Summons on Cross-Complaint issued and filed.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint for Equitable Indemnity and Contribution filed by Espinoza Diaz, Lucina.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Andre Lashawn Haynes (Defendant); Central California Leasing and Equipment, Inc. (Defendant); Gary Armagnac (Defendant); Henry Armagnac (Defendant); Leah Bala Caras (Plaintiff); Lucina Espinoza Diaz (Defendant); Mike Blanco (Defendant); Remigio Arcelo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Cross-Complaint of Defendant Lucina Espinoza Diaz filed by Central California Leasing and Equipment, Inc.; Central California Leasing and Equipment, Inc.; Central California Leasing And Equipment, Inc..; Action Type: Answer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Thomas C. Jedding, retained for Henry Armagnac .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Thomas C. Jedding, retained for Gary Armagnac .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCross-Defendants, Henry Armagnac and Gary Armagnac's Answer to Cross-Complain for Equitable Indemnity and Contribution filed by Armagnac, Henry.; Action Type: Answer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Lucina Espinoza Diaz served on 11/15/2021 by Personal Service. $135.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Andre Lashawn Haynes served on 11/09/2021 by Personal Service. $45.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Remigio Arcelo served on 10/26/2021 by Personal Service. $50.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Mike Blanco served on 10/26/2021 by Personal Service. $50.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Gary Armagnac served on 10/28/2021 by Personal Service. $100.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Lawrance A. Bohm, retained for Leah Bala Caras .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 04/20/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssociation of Counsel filed by Caras, Leah Bala.; Action Type: Association of Counsel; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Caras, Leah Bala.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Caras, Leah Bala.; Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Leah Caras in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 690749.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Lawrance A. Bohm, retained for Leah Bala Caras .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kronlund, Michael C