This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/21/2020 at 03:27:56 (UTC).

Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper et al. vs Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2261

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper

Cooper, Constance

Defendants

Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company

Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, LLC, dba Golden Living Center Chateau, a California limited liability company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moore, Jody C.

Defendant Attorney

Weintraub, Shari I

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/16/2020 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper; Cooper, Constance. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice to Filing Party

02/28/2020: Notice to Filing Party

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, LLC, dba Golden Living Center Chateau, a California limited liability company. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer of Defendant Dycora Transitional Health - Quail Lake LLC to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, LLC, dba Golden Living Center Chateau, a California limited liability company served on 10/01/2019 by Personal Service. $150.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company served on 10/07/2019 by Substituted Service. $150.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration of Constance Cooper RE Standing on Behalf of Lavera Reed filed by Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper; Cooper, Constance. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper; Cooper, Constance. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper; Cooper, Constance. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Constance Cooper (Plaintiff); Participant: Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper (Plaintiff); Participant: Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, LLC, dba Golden Living Center Chateau, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Constance Cooper (Plaintiff); Participant: Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper (Plaintiff); Participant: Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, LLC, dba Golden Living Center Chateau, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 05/17/2021 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 05/03/2021 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Held; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Constance Cooper (Plaintiff); Participant: Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Participant: Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper (Plaintiff); Participant: Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, LLC, dba Golden Living Center Chateau, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 16, 2020. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/16/2020 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPayment received by by Lavera Reed in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 544898. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPayment received by a Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 541795. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Beverly Health and Rehabilitation Services, LLC, dba Golden Living Center Chateau, a California limited liability company served on 10/01/2019 by Personal Service. $150.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Dycora Transitional Health-Quail Lake LLC, a California limited liability company served on 10/07/2019 by Substituted Service. $150.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/16/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper; Cooper, Constance. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Constance Cooper RE Standing on Behalf of Lavera Reed filed by Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper; Cooper, Constance. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lavera Reed, by and through her Successor in Interest, Constance Cooper; Cooper, Constance. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by by Lavera Reed in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 474055. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.