This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/25/2023 at 23:04:10 (UTC).

Laureen Thompson vs California Schools Employees Association et al.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Laureen Thompson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Schools Employees Association. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0038

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thompson, Laureen

Defendants

Gaulman, Roderick

Thompson, Casey

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Thompson, Laureen.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Amended Complaint filed by Thompson, Laureen.

Declaration

Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Amended Complaint filed by Thompson, Laureen.

Second Amended Complaint

Second Amended Complaint filed by Thompson, Laureen.

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Thompson, Laureen.

Notice to Filing Party

03/17/2022: Notice to Filing Party

Order After Hearing

Order Sustaining CSEA's Demurrer to First Amended Complaint filed by California Schools Employees Association.

Declaration in Support

Declaration Of Amy Dunning Regarding Proposed Order Sustaining California School Employees Association’s Demurrer To First Amended Complaint filed by California Schools Employees Association.

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by California Schools Employees Association.

Order After Hearing

Order Sustaining California School Employees Association's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint without Leave to Amend filed by California Schools Employees Association.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by California Schools Employees Association.

Declaration

Declaration of Amy Dunning Regarding Proposed Order Sustaining California School Employees Association's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint filed by California Schools Employees Association.

Miscellaneous

Proposed Order Cover Sheet filed by California Schools Employees Association.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 12/15/2022 09:00 AM .

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published.

Notice to Filing Party

12/06/2022: Notice to Filing Party

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against California Schools Employees Association Not Entered

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Demurrer held on 09/29/2022 09:00 AM .

99 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; California Schools Employees Association (Defendant); Laureen Thompson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Sustaining California School Employees Association's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint without Leave to Amend filed by California Schools Employees Association.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by California Schools Employees Association.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Amy Dunning Regarding Proposed Order Sustaining California School Employees Association's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint filed by California Schools Employees Association.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Cover Sheet filed by California Schools Employees Association.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Demurrer; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; California Schools Employees Association (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Demurrer held on 12/15/2022 09:00 AM .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Demurrer held on December 15, 2022.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Demurrer and Demurrer (amount over $10,000 up to $25,000) filed by California Schools Employees Association.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketPayment received by California Schools Employees Association in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 639165.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to California Schools Employees Association served on 03/04/2021 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/01/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Thompson, Laureen.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, Laureen.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Laureen Thompson in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 611707.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Holly, Carter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less