This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 23:59:11 (UTC).

Laura Nickteloy Mendez vs Dante Hector Arenas

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 Laura Nickteloy Mendez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Dante Hector Arenas. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1478

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mendez, Laura Nickteloy

Respondent

Arenas, Dante Hector

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lee, Christie S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $28.00, receipt number 279762. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Findings and Order to Terminate Restraining Order after Hearing entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Amended Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference held on 03/27/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference held on 03/27/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Hearing re: Settlement Conference held on March 27, 2018. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Arenas, Dante Hector. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Proof of service filed by Mendez, Laura Nickteloy. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2017
  • Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 04/11/2017. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application filed by Mendez, Laura Nickteloy. Action Type: Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children filed by Mendez, Laura Nickteloy. Action Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Mendez, Laura Nickteloy. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Attorney, Christie S Lee, retained for Laura Nickteloy Mendez . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Payment received by Laura Mendez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 152946. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Mendez, Laura Nickteloy. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Mendez, Laura Nickteloy. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee, Christie S