This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 08:06:02 (UTC).

Laura Lopez vs R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Laura Lopez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against R S Barnes Enterprises, Inc , A California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2125

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lopez, Laura

Defendants

Barnes, Robert

Barnes, Sandra

R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Basham, Gary R

Defendant Attorney

Shibayama, Scott

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal as to 13th cause of action ONLY filed by Lopez, Laura. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Barnes, Sandra. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 01/23/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice

Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Barnes, Sandra; R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation; Barnes, Robert. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation served on 03/29/2016. Type of Service Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Robert Barnes served on 03/29/2016. Type of Service Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sandra Barnes served on 03/29/2016. Type of Service Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Laura. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Laura Lopez, R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation, Robert Barnes, Sandra Barnes Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 04/17/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Barnes, Robert; Barnes, Sandra; R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Barnes, Sandra. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Change of Address of Plaintiff's counsel

Notice of Change of Address of Plaintiff's counsel filed by Lopez, Laura. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer to Complaint

ANSWER to Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation; Barnes, Sandra; Barnes, Robert. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Laura Lopez, R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation, Robert Barnes, Sandra Barnes Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Lopez, Laura. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal as to 13th cause of action ONLY filed by Lopez, Laura. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 04/17/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/23/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Hearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on April 17, 2017. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Barnes, Robert; Barnes, Sandra; R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Lopez, Laura. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Robert Barnes served on 03/29/2016. Type of Service Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to R & S Barnes Enterprises, Inc., A California Corporation served on 03/29/2016. Type of Service Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/29/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lopez, Laura. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Lopez, Laura. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by Basham Law Group, Inc. in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 36404. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Gary R Basham, retained for Laura Lopez . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less