This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/05/2022 at 18:00:35 (UTC).

Latrice McFarland et al. vs Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 Latrice McFarland filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ruiz Sons Transport LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0186

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McFarland, Latrice

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

Raudel Mota aka Raudel Llamasmota

Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC

Ruiz, Jr., Jesus

Tuff Boy Leasing, LLC

Ruiz, Jesus Jr.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Tuff Boy Leasing, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ginsburg, William S.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Bednar, Jane E

Jaime, Matthew C

 

Court Documents

Summons on Cross-Complaint

Summons on Cross-Complaint of Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC issued and filed.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Raudel Mota AKA Raudel Llamasmota; Ruiz, Jesus Jr.; Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC.

Answer

Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC, Jesus Ruiz Jr., and Raudel Mota aka Raudel Llamasmota Answer to Complaint filed by Ruiz, Jr., Jesus; Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC; Raudel Mota aka Raudel Llamasmota.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by McFarland, Latrice.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Tuff Boy Leasing, LLC served on 01/19/2022 by Substituted Service. $65.00.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Tuff Boy Leasing, LLC.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by McFarland, Latrice.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Strike; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Jesus Ruiz, Jr. (Defendant); Raudel Mota aka Raudel Llamasmota (Defendant); Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Strike Cross-Complaint; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Jesus Ruiz, Jr. (Defendant); Raudel Mota aka Raudel Llamasmota (Defendant); Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Strike Answer; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Jesus Ruiz, Jr. (Defendant); Raudel Mota aka Raudel Llamasmota (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Jesus Ruiz, Jr. (Defendant); Latrice McFarland (Plaintiff); Raudel Mota aka Raudel Llamasmota (Defendant); Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC (Defendant); Tuff Boy Leasing, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Latrice McFarland in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 751638.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by McFarland, Latrice.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service Cover Page filed by Ruiz, Jesus Jr.; Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC; Raudel Mota AKA Raudel Llamasmota.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Ruiz, Jesus Jr.; Ruiz & Sons Transport LLC; Raudel Mota AKA Raudel Llamasmota.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion to Strike defts' llamasmota and Ruiz motion to strike answers, set for 08/09/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint filed by Tuff Boy Leasing, LLC.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/11/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by McFarland, Latrice.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by McFarland, Latrice.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Latrice McFarland in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 709315.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAttorney, William S. Ginsburg, retained for Latrice McFarland .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jane E Bednar, retained for Raudel Mota AKA Raudel Llamasmota .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tuff Boy Leasing is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jane E. Bednar

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAIME, MATTHEW C