This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/20/2018 at 06:58:03 (UTC).

Latoyia Singleton vs Just The Tip Vapors, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/22/2016 Latoyia Singleton filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Just The Tip Vapors, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3877

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Singleton, Latoyia

Defendant

Just The Tip Vapors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Friedman, Todd M.

 

Court Documents

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Latoyia Singleton against Just The Tip Vapors, LLC in the amount of 93614.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration of Latoyia Singleton in Support of Request for Default Judgment filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration of Todd M. Friedman in Support of Motion to Enter Default Judgment filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 10/19/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service filed by Singleton, Latoyia. (DUPLICATE FILING) Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Just The Tip Vapors, LLC Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Just The Tip Vapors, LLC served on 06/13/2016 by Substituted Service. $85.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Latoyia Singleton against Just The Tip Vapors, LLC in the amount of 93614.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Todd M. Friedman in Support of Motion to Enter Default Judgment filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Latoyia Singleton in Support of Request for Default Judgment filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 10/19/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on October 19, 2016. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/06/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Just The Tip Vapors, LLC served on 06/13/2016 by Substituted Service. $85.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/19/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 53541. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Singleton, Latoyia. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • Attorney, Todd M. Friedman, retained for Latoyia Singleton . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less