This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:52:21 (UTC).

Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP vs Highway Hospitality, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Highway Hospitality, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1973

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP

Defendant

Highway Hospitality, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Urbanic, Joseph T.

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Pre-Judgment Interest Calculation filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Holly, Carter.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP against Highway Hospitality, LLC in the amount of 7958.14. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration in Lieu of Testimony for Judgment by Default filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Highway Hospitality, LLC served on 11/18/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration RE: Attorney Fees filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP against Highway Hospitality, LLC in the amount of 7958.14. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Pre-Judgment Interest Calculation filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Lieu of Testimony for Judgment by Default filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration RE: Attorney Fees filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Request for Default against Highway Hospitality, LLC Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Highway Hospitality, LLC served on 11/18/2016 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Joseph T. Urbanic, retained for Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 35131. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company LP. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less