This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/18/2022 at 02:57:53 (UTC).

La-Tanga Hopes vs Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 La-Tanga Hopes filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fattarsi, Jonathan W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1303

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hopes, La-Tanga

Defendant

Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Hopes, La-Tanga.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 02/28/2022 01:30 PM .

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed.

received letter

Received letter filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceived letter filed by Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company.; Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Result: Held; Judge: Jonathan W. Fattarsi; Participants; Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company (Defendant); La-Tanga Hopes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on February 28, 2022.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Judgment entered and filed.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 02/28/2022 01:30 PM .; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial principle 10000.00 costs 75.00, set for 02/28/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Fattarsi in Department 3A.; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Hopes, La-Tanga.; Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketPayment received by La-Tanga Hopes in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 703426.; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR is a litigant