Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/07/2021 at 10:46:55 (UTC).

Kisha Walters vs Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Kisha Walters filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger and Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0495

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walters, Kisha

Defendant

Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scardigli, Nicholas John

Defendant Attorneys

Davis, Jahmal T.

Echavarria, Camilo

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/20/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

CM-110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Nicholas F. Scardigli in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and for Sanctions filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Opposition

Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and for Sanctions filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Motion

Amended Notice Of Motion And Motion Of Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.'S To Compel Responses To Requests For Admission And For Sanctions filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Motion

Notice of Motion and Motion of Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.'s Compel Responses to Requests for Admissions and for Sanctions filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and for Sanctions filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Declaration In Support

Declaration of Jerri Kay-Phillips in Support of Defendants Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and for Sanctions filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

04/01/2021: UNKNOWN

answer

Defendant Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS-010

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. served on 12/16/2020 by Personal Service. $28.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Kisha Walters (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 08/18/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Kisha Walters (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Kisha Walters in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 647143. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/20/2021 08:30 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 20, 2021. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Compel; Court Room: 11B; Result: Dropped; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc.. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Camilo Echavarria, retained for Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. Dollar Tree Distribution in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 616113. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. served on 12/16/2020 by Personal Service. $28.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/20/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Walters, Kisha. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Kisha Walters in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 607203. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Nicholas John Scardigli, retained for Kisha Walters . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCARDIGLI, NICHOLAS J.