This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/17/2022 at 12:28:15 (UTC).

Kim Mathues et al. vs Emily J Clark

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 Kim Mathues filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Emily J Clark. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0230

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shaw, Randy

Mathues, Kim

Defendant

Clark, Emily J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fagundes, Joseph H

Defendant Attorney

Davenport, Gregory R

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Shaw, Randy; Mathues, Kim. Action Type: Notice of Lis Pendens; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shaw, Randy; Mathues, Kim. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Shaw, Randy; Mathues, Kim. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Emily J Clark served on 05/04/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Verified Answer to Complaint------First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Clark, Emily J. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mathues, Kim; Shaw, Randy. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Clark, Emily J. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Mathues, Kim. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order Vacating Case Management Conference and Setting for Trial Filed Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing - Civil Jury Trial

Hearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 09/19/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Order

Order Vacating Case Management Conference and Setting for Trial Filed Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Emily J Clark (Defendant); Participant: Kim Mathues (Plaintiff); Participant: Randy Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Emily J Clark (Defendant); Participant: Kim Mathues (Plaintiff); Participant: Randy Shaw (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Emily Clark in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 657837. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 09/19/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Vacating Case Management Conference and Setting for Trial Filed Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Mathues, Kim. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Kim Mathues in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 655689. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Mathues, Kim; Shaw, Randy. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Clark, Emily J. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/09/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens filed by Shaw, Randy; Mathues, Kim. Action Type: Notice of Lis Pendens; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shaw, Randy; Mathues, Kim. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Shaw, Randy; Mathues, Kim. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Kim Mathues in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 613520. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Joseph H Fagundes, retained for Randy Shaw . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Joseph H Fagundes, retained for Kim Mathues . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davenport, Gregory R