This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:37:06 (UTC).

Khamphone McCarthy vs James Francis McCarthy

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Khamphone McCarthy filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against James Francis McCarthy. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0880

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

McCarthy, Khamphone

Respondent

McCarthy, James Francis

Not Classified By Court

Troop - 2016, Shelly

Interested Party

County Of San Joaquin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Luna, Bobby

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2017
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Khamphone McCarthy, James Francis McCarthy Entered. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Modification held on April 13, 2017. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Request for Order-Modification held on 04/13/2017 08:15 AM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by McCarthy, James Francis. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (No Fee) filed by McCarthy, Khamphone. Action Type: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (No Fee); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service filed by McCarthy, Khamphone. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to James Francis McCarthy Granted. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Request for Telephonic Appearance filed by McCarthy, James Francis. Action Type: Request for Telephonic Appearance; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Proof of service filed by McCarthy, James Francis. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Modification Resp's RFO Mod child custody and visitation, set for 04/13/2017 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time Granted and filed on 03/02/2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • RFO Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time-Submitted submitted by MCCarthy, Khamphone. Action Type: RFO Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time-Submitted; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to James Francis MCCarthy filed. Served on 02/25/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Khamphone MCCarthy filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by MCCarthy, Khamphone. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Bobby Luna, retained for Khamphone MCCarthy . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by MCCarthy, Khamphone. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less