This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/22/2023 at 07:05:12 (UTC).

Khalysha Walker et al. vs West Coast Hauling, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Khalysha Walker filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against West Coast Hauling, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0053

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jackson, Adriana

Walker, Khalysha

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

West Coast Hauling, Inc.

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

Walker, Khalysha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ostoia, Adina A.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

Bangle, Raymond III

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jackson, Adriana; Walker, Khalysha.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jackson, Adriana; Walker, Khalysha.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to West Coast Hauling, Inc. served on 03/01/2023 by Substituted Service. $125.00.

DELETE

Proof of Service of Summons as to West Coast Hauling, Inc. served on 03/01/2023 by Substituted Service. $125.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to West Coast Hauling, Inc. served on 03/07/2023 by Substituted Service. $185.00.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Walker, Khalysha; Jackson, Adriana.

SUM110 Summons - Cross Complaint

Cross-Complaint Summons issued and filed.

Answer

Defendant West Coast hauling Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed by West Coast Hauling, Inc..

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint for Indemnity filed by West Coast Hauling, Inc..

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by West Coast Hauling, Inc..

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by West Coast Hauling, Inc..

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/10/2023 08:45 AM .

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Adriana Jackson (Plaintiff); Khalysha Walker (Cross-Defendant); Khalysha Walker (Plaintiff); West Coast Hauling, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); West Coast Hauling, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Result: Held; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Adriana Jackson (Plaintiff); Khalysha Walker (Plaintiff); West Coast Hauling, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/14/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/10/2023 08:45 AM .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 10, 2023.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by West Coast Hauling, Inc..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by West Coast Hauling, Inc..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Summons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint for Indemnity filed by West Coast Hauling, Inc..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant West Coast hauling Inc.'s Answer to Complaint filed by West Coast Hauling, Inc..; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to West Coast Hauling, Inc. served on 03/01/2023 by Substituted Service. $125.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/10/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Jackson, Adriana; Walker, Khalysha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Jackson, Adriana; Walker, Khalysha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Khalysha Walker in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 784442.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Adina A. Ostoia, retained for Adriana Jackson .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Adina A. Ostoia, retained for Khalysha Walker .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less