This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:38:03 (UTC).

Khaem Southavong et al. vs Edgar Lorenzana et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Khaem Southavong filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Edgar Lorenzana. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1812

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Williams, Zachery

Southavong, Khaem

Defendants

Lorenzana, Edgar

Express Freight System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geraghty, Thomas S.

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

03/28/2016: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Khaem Southavong filed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Southavong, Khaem. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/25/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Khaem Southavong, Zachery Williams, Edgar Lorenzana, Express Freight System Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/23/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Southavong, Khaem. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Khaem Southavong, Zachery Williams, Edgar Lorenzana, Express Freight System Entered. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/25/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Case Management Conference scheduled on 08/25/2016 at 8:30 AM has been Continued. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/23/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/25/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 11. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Khaem Southavong filed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Southavong, Khaem. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Southavong, Khaem. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Southavong, Khaem. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Thomas S. Geraghty, retained for Khaem Southavong . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Thomas S. Geraghty, retained for Zachery Williams . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less