This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/23/2018 at 11:24:49 (UTC).

Kevin Wentworth vs. Melvin Cruz

Case Summary

On 04/10/2014 Kevin Wentworth filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Melvin Cruz. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3519

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wentworth, Kevin

Defendant

Cruz, Melvin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mootz, James P

 

Court Documents

Notice that you have been sued

04/10/2014: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

04/10/2014: Payment Receipt

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

10/15/2014: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

 

Docket Entries

11/04/2014

Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2014

Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

Complaint associated on 11/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

Automatic Failure to File Default Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

Status of Melvin Cruz updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

Status of Kevin Wentworth updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

Motion - Other (CLM) - RE OSC scheduled for 11/13/2014 at 03:00:00 PM in M2 was vacated. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2014

Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
04/10/2014

Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Original Summons filed by Wentworth, Kevin on 04/10/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wentworth, Kevin on 04/10/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2014

Complaint filed by Wentworth, Kevin on 04/10/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less