This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 11:48:08 (UTC).

Kevin Morris vs Analisa Campos

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 Kevin Morris filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Analisa Campos. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1188

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Morris, Kevin

Respondent

Campos, Analisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketStipulated Qualified Domestic Relations Order filed. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $1.00, receipt number 239215. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Kevin Morris in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 239213. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $0.50, receipt number 232830. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Morris, Kevin. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $3.00, receipt number 226508. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • DocketFamily Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Campos, Analisa. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketAppearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by Morris, Kevin. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2016
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Analisa Campos filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Campos, Analisa. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • DocketResponse and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Campos, Analisa. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Analisa Campos filed. Served on 04/20/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Craig S Marks, retained for Kevin Morris . Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 38994. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Morris, Kevin. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Morris, Kevin. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less