This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 10:18:30 (UTC).

Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons vs Concrete, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2022 Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Concrete, Inc dba Knife River Construction, a California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2317

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons

Defendants

Concrete, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a California Corporation

Knife River Construction, a Delaware Corporation

MDU Resources Group, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a Delaware Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marquez, Justin F.

Defendant Attorney

Eddings, Ryan L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Concrete, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a California Corporation served on 04/26/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Knife River Construction, a Delaware Corporation served on 04/26/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to MDU Resources Group, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a Delaware Corporation served on 04/26/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.

Answer

Answer .....First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Concrete, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a California Corporation; MDU Resources Group, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a Delaware Corporation.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Concrete, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a California Corporation; MDU Resources Group, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a Delaware Corporation.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 09/26/2022 08:30 AM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 12/07/2022 08:45 AM .

Stipulation and Order

Joint Stipulation to Consolidate; Order signed by Judge Waters on 12/16/2022 entered and filed.

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement filed by Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCase associated with case: , STK-CV-UOE-2021-0010183; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation to Consolidate; Order signed by Judge Waters on 12/16/2022 entered and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference Consolidation? Lead Case will be in 11B CV-2021-10183, set 4/7/23 8:30AM, set for 04/07/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement filed by Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 12/07/2022 08:45 AM .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on December 7, 2022.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Knife River Construction, a Delaware Corporation served on 04/26/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Concrete, Inc. dba Knife River Construction, a California Corporation served on 04/26/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/26/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Justin F. Marquez, retained for Kenneth Wilburn, on behalf of the State of California and other aggrieved persons .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketPayment received by on Kenneth Wilburn in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 727429.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Knife river Construction, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where MDU Resources Group, Inc., d/b/a/ Knife River Construction, a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where LLP CONCRETE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eddings, Ryan L.