This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 04:08:24 (UTC).

Kelkris Associates, Inc DBA Credit Bureau Associates vs. Phillip W English

Case Summary

On 07/16/2009 Kelkris Associates, Inc DBA Credit Bureau Associates filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Phillip W English. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3011

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelkris Associates, Inc Dba Credit Bureau Associates

Defendants

English, Phillip W

English, Kristi Nicole

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

07/21/2009: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt - Void

05/21/2010: Payment Receipt - Void

Payment Receipt

05/26/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

05/21/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

07/22/2009: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

10/28/2009: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Void Payment Acknowledgement

05/21/2010: Void Payment Acknowledgement

Payment Receipt

01/05/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

07/21/2009: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Judgement Public Civil

01/01/1900: Archival Judgement Public Civil

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

Archival Complaint Petition Civil Public

01/01/1900: Archival Complaint Petition Civil Public

Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

01/01/1900: Archival Filing Civil Criminal Public

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketThe status of Award1 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2013
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of filed by Kelkris Associates, Inc DBA Credit Bureau Associates on 08/22/2013. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketFee for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil, transaction number created on 05/26/2010 canceled due to Other. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketAbstract issued. WAS ENTERED IN ERROR. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 05/26/2010, transaction number and receipt number 129717. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • DocketWrit issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil in the amount of 25.00 on 05/21/2010, transaction number and receipt number 128984. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketAssociation created between Duree, Terry A. and Kelkris Associates, Inc DBA Credit Bureau Associates. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketPayment for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil, transaction number in the amount of 25.00 voided due to Incorrect Fee Codes. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • DocketAbstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketPayment received for 30 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K in the amount of 200.00 on 07/21/2009, transaction number 367669 and receipt number 80673. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketAddress for Terry Duree selected. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketContact information updated for Duree,Terry . Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketEnglish,Philip selected to be used on case. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 12/21/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in T2 at Tracy Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Kelkris Associates, Inc DBA Credit Bureau Associates on 07/16/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kelkris Associates, Inc DBA Credit Bureau Associates on 07/16/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2009
  • DocketComplaint filed by Kelkris Associates, Inc DBA Credit Bureau Associates on 07/16/2009. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KELKRIS ASSOCIATES, INC is a litigant