This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/31/2018 at 04:54:39 (UTC).

Kayla Burgstrom vs. GMRI, Inc

Case Summary

On 11/28/2012 Kayla Burgstrom filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GMRI, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4526

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

Kayla Burgstrom

Chaffer, Britany

Kille, Sara

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Inda, Amanda

George, Brittany

Martin, Rebecca

Sanderson, Jessica

Vargas, Tiffany

Oyen, Vivian

Burgstrom, Kayla

Vargas, Tara

Miscellaneous Participant,

Defendants

GMRI, Inc

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Olive Garden Usa, A Business Entity Of Unknown Form

Darden Restaurants, Inc, A Corporation

Conley, Bill

Miscellaneous Participant,

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Burgstrom, Kayla. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Kayla Burgstrom, Miscellaneous Participant 1, Britany Chaffer, Brittany George, Amanda Inda, Sara Kille, Rebecca Martin, Vivian Oyen, Jessica Sanderson, Tara Vargas, Tiffany Vargas, Gmri, Inc, Olive Garden Usa, A Business Entity Of Unknown Form, Darden Restaurants, Inc, A Corporation, Miscellaneous Participant 1, Bill Conley Granted. With Prejudice Judge: Ross, Roger.

Minute Order

03/05/2015: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

09/25/2013: Payment Receipt

Notice Reassignment Judicial San Joaquin

09/11/2013: Notice Reassignment Judicial San Joaquin

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

09/04/2013: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Payment Receipt

02/26/2013: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

01/29/2013: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

11/28/2012: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Minute Order

10/02/2014: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/05/2013: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

12/03/2013: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

10/23/2013: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

10/18/2013: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

09/04/2013: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

07/24/2013: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

02/27/2013: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

11/28/2012: Payment Receipt

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Burgstrom, Kayla. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2015
  • Case status updated to Dismissed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2015
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Kayla Burgstrom, Miscellaneous Participant 1, Britany Chaffer, Brittany George, Amanda Inda, Sara Kille, Rebecca Martin, Vivian Oyen, Jessica Sanderson, Tara Vargas, Tiffany Vargas, Gmri, Inc, Olive Garden Usa, A Business Entity Of Unknown Form, Darden Restaurants, Inc, A Corporation, Miscellaneous Participant 1, Bill Conley Granted. With Prejudice Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Burgstrom, Kayla. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2015
  • Scheduling auto case clock expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Matter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Volume updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference heard 03/05/2015 08:30:00 AM. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
292 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2012
  • Status of Rebecca Martin updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Status of Rebecca Martin updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Status of Rebecca Martin updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Status of Sara Kille updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 04/29/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Holland, Lesley. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Burgstrom, Kayla; Chaffer, Britany; George, Brittany; Inda, Amanda; Kille, Sara; Martin, Rebecca; Oyen, Vivian; Sanderson, Jessica; Vargas, Tara; Vargas, Tiffany on 11/28/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Burgstrom, Kayla; Chaffer, Britany; George, Brittany; Inda, Amanda; Kille, Sara; Martin, Rebecca; Oyen, Vivian; Sanderson, Jessica; Vargas, Tara; Vargas, Tiffany on 11/28/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • Complaint filed by Burgstrom, Kayla; Chaffer, Britany; George, Brittany; Inda, Amanda; Kille, Sara; Martin, Rebecca; Oyen, Vivian; Sanderson, Jessica; Vargas, Tara; Vargas, Tiffany on 11/28/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.