This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 08:59:34 (UTC).

Katherine Wallace vs Gregory Wallace

Case Summary

On 01/09/2017 Katherine Wallace filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Gregory Wallace. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0115

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wallace, Katherine

Respondent

Wallace, Gregory

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $2.00, receipt number 280680. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Wallace, Katherine. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on December 4, 2017. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 12/04/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Hearing re: Settlement Conference held on October 30, 2017. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference held on 10/30/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Order After Hearing filed by Katherine Wallace, Gregory Wallace. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2017
  • Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 01/24/2017. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application filed by Wallace, Katherine. Action Type: Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children filed by Wallace, Katherine. Action Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Katherine Wallace. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Wallace, Katherine. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Wallace, Katherine. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Wallace, Katherine. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Wallace, Katherine. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less