This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 10:05:44 (UTC).

Katherine Politovich vs California Department of State Hospitals et al.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2016 Katherine Politovich filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against California Department of State Hospitals. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kronlund, Barbara and Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3438

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kronlund, Barbara

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Politovich, Katherine

Defendants

California Department of State Hospitals

Corpuz, Edmund

California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paboojian, Warren R

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Corpuz, Edmund. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Order

Order Granting Consolidation of Actions filed by California Department of State Hospitals, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate held on 08/31/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration of Bart Hightower in support of statement of non-opposition

Declaration of Bart Hightower in support of statement of non-opposition filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Statement of non-opposition

Statement of non-opposition to DEFTS CA Dept. of State Hospitals & CA Dept. of Corrections & Rehab's motion to consolidate action filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Statement - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

declaration of Service

Declaration of service filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

First Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Politovich, Katherine. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Consolidate Action filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Lauren Sible in Support of Motion to Consolidate Actions filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate Actions filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Motion (No Fee); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Politovich, Katherine. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Politovich, Katherine. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/07/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2016
  • Case associated with case: , STK-CV-UOE-2016-0004367 STK-CV-UOE-2016-0008670 Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Corpuz, Edmund. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Carter Holly Assigned. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Case associated with case: , STK-CV-UOE-2016-0004367 Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Consolidation of Actions filed by California Department of State Hospitals, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Hearing re: Motion to Consolidate held on August 31, 2016. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Consolidate held on 08/31/2016 09:00 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Consolidate Action filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Consolidate Actions filed by California Department of State Hospitals; California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Action Type: Motion (No Fee); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Consolidate by Dept. of St. Hospitals and CA Dept. of Corrections & Rehabilitation, set for 08/31/2016 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/07/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 49674. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Politovich, Katherine. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Politovich, Katherine. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less