This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 07:29:57 (UTC).

Kapoor Ajay et al. vs Richmond American Homes of Maryland, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Kapoor Ajay filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Richmond American Homes of Maryland, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ross, Roger and Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0683

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ross, Roger

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ajay, Kapoor

Kapoor, Alka

Defendant

Richmond American Homes of Maryland, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abdallah, Mitchell L

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Kapoor Ajay, Alka Kapoor, Richmond American Homes of Maryland, Inc. Entered. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

CIV-110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Kapoor, Alka; Ajay, Kapoor. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice

Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Ajay, Kapoor; Kapoor, Alka. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ajay, Kapoor; Kapoor, Alka. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice to Filing Party

12/18/2020: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Kapoor, Alka; Ajay, Kapoor. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Roger Ross; Participant: Alka Kapoor (Plaintiff); Participant: Kapoor Ajay (Plaintiff); Participant: Richmond American Homes of Maryland, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Kapoor Ajay, Alka Kapoor, Richmond American Homes of Maryland, Inc. Entered. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Kapoor, Alka; Ajay, Kapoor. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWithdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Ajay, Kapoor; Kapoor, Alka. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ajay, Kapoor; Kapoor, Alka. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/16/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Kapoor, Alka; Ajay, Kapoor. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Kapoor Ajay in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 608297. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Mitchell L Abdallah, retained for Alka Kapoor . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Mitchell L Abdallah, retained for Kapoor Ajay . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF MARYLAND INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abdallah, Mitchell L