This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 06:09:13 (UTC).

Kafia Abbasi, MD vs St. Joseph's Medical Center, a corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Kafia Abbasi, MD filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against St Joseph's Medical Center, a corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2253

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abbasi, MD, Kafia

Defendants

St. Joseph's Medical Center, a corporation

Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a healthcare organization

Callcott, MD, Frank S.

Goltser, MD, Anatolly

Howen, MD, Robert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kapoor, Sunita

Defendant Attorneys

Roundy, Stephanie

Ginns, Scott A

Marsh, Barry C

Hodges, Robert W.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Abbasi, MD, Kafia. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abbasi, MD, Kafia. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Robert Howen, MD served on 05/17/2021 by Substituted Service. $125.00. NO DUE DILIGENCE ATTACHED Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a healthcare organization served on 05/17/2021 by Substituted Service. $125.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to St. Joseph's Medical Center, a corporation served on 05/14/2021 by Substituted Service. $115.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Frank S. Callcott, MD served on 05/28/2021 by Substituted Service. $85.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Anatolly Goltser, MD served on 05/20/2021 by Personal Service. $165.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by St. Joseph's Medical Center, a corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by St. Joseph's Medical Center, a corporation. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

answer

Answer To Complaint For Damages filed by Goltser, MD, Anatolly. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Answer

Answer to Complaint for Damages filed by Callcott, MD, Frank S.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

Response

Defendant Robert Howen, M.D.'s Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Howen, MD, Robert. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participant: Anatolly Goltser, MD (Defendant); Participant: Frank S. Callcott, MD (Defendant); Participant: Kafia Abbasi, MD (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert Howen, MD (Defendant); Participant: St. Joseph's Medical Center, a corporation (Defendant); Participant: Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a healthcare organization (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Robert W. Hodges, retained for Robert Howen, MD . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Robert Howen, M.D.'s Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (amount over $25,000) filed by Howen, MD, Robert. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received by MD, Howen in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 656077. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPayment received by MD, Callcott in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 654962. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint for Damages filed by Callcott, MD, Frank S.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer To Complaint For Damages filed by Goltser, MD, Anatolly. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received by MD, Goltser in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 655075. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPayment received by MD, Goltser in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 655075. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Barry C Marsh, retained for Anatolly Goltser, MD . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a healthcare organization served on 05/17/2021 by Substituted Service. $125.00. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Robert Howen, MD served on 05/17/2021 by Substituted Service. $125.00. NO DUE DILIGENCE ATTACHED Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 09/13/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abbasi, MD, Kafia. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Abbasi, MD, Kafia. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Sunita Kapoor, retained for Kafia Abbasi, MD . Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketPayment received by MD Abbasi in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 629548. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Abdallah, George J..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sutter Gould Medical Foundation, a healthcare organization is a litigant

Latest cases where C.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where St. Joseph's Medical Center is a litigant