This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/25/2019 at 15:59:43 (UTC).

K & S Staffing Solutions, Inc. vs The Western Surety Company et al.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 K S Staffing Solutions, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against The Western Surety Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Humphreys, Elizabeth and Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1949

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Humphreys, Elizabeth

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

K & S Staffing Solutions, Inc.

Security Paving Company, Inc., a California corporation

VSS International, Inc., a California corporation

Defendants and Cross Defendants

VSS International, Inc.

The Western Surety Company

Telfer Pavement Technologies, LLC

Coral Construction Company

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

J. McLoughlin Engineering Co., Inc.

Tutor-Saliba Corporation

Continental Casualty Company

Security Paving Company, Inc.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Cal Electro, Inc.

Griffith Company

Great American Insurance Company

Toro Enterprises, Inc.

Schroyer, William

Tiitan D.V.B.E. Inc., a California corporation

Titan D.V.B.E., Inc., a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Shaffer, Robert H.

Weber, Matthew J

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Peltier, John K

Shaffer, Robert H.

Pierce, Ronald B.

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application for Order Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by K & S Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Action Type: Ex Parte Application; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 04/24/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 08/14/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion for Griffith Company's Summary Adjudication Motion on Sixth Cause of Action of Second Amended Complaint ....filed by Griffith Company. Action Type: MSJ/MSA Supporting Documents; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Tiitan D.V.B.E. Inc., a California corporation served on 05/01/2018 by Personal Service. $254.86. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by VSS International, Inc., a California corporation; VSS International, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Security Paving Company, Inc.; Continental Casualty Company. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 05/26/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial , set for 06/29/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 05/26/2020 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Trial Setting Conference held on July 24, 2019. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Setting Conference held on 07/24/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by VSS International, Inc., a California corporation; VSS International, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address filed by Security Paving Company, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
122 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint filed by K & S Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Amended Summons; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/10/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketAttorney, Matthew J Weber, retained for K & S Staffing Solutions, Inc. . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. K & S Staffing Solutions in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 230583. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by K & S Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by K & S Staffing Solutions, Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coral Construction Company Restated Employee Profit Sharing Plan & Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Tiitan D.V.B.E. Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where TELFER PAVEMENT TECHNOLOGIES LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TORO ENTERPRISES INC . is a litigant