This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/07/2023 at 02:01:09 (UTC).

Julie Adams vs Jason Hughes

Case Summary

On 07/08/2022 Julie Adams filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Jason Hughes. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5710

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Adams, Julie

Respondent

Hughes, Jason

 

Court Documents

CivilRestrainingOrderNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Adams, Julie.

CH100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Adams, Julie.

CH110 MP Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 07/11/2022.

CH109 Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Julie Adams.

CH200 MP Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service of Civil Harassment Restraining Order as to Jason Hughes served on 07/22/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service filed by Adams, Julie.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 08/02/2022 10:30 AM .

CH130 MP Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing

The Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 08/03/2022. See Order filed herein.

CH130A MP Civil Harrassment Restraining Order After Hearing Amended

The Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 08/03/2022. See Order filed herein.

CH260 MP Proof of Service of Order After Hearing by Mai

Proof of Service of CH-130, Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing as to Jason Hughes served on 12/06/2022 by Mailing. $0.00.

 

Docket Entries

12/29/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of CH-130, Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing as to Jason Hughes served on 12/06/2022 by Mailing. $0.00.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2022
View Court Documents

DocketThe Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 08/03/2022. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022

HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M1; Result: Held; Judge: Seth R. Hoyt Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 08/02/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022

DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on August 2, 2022.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2022
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Unsuccessful Service filed by Adams, Julie.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Civil Harassment Restraining Order as to Jason Hughes served on 07/22/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2022

DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 08/02/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Seth R. Hoyt Jr. in Department M1.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Julie Adams.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 07/11/2022.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Adams, Julie.; Judge: Hoyt, Seth R. Jr.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Adams, Julie.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less