This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 05:39:33 (UTC).

Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja vs Victory Packaging, a business entity et al.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Victory Packaging, a business entity. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3073

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja

Defendants

Westrock Consumer Packaging Group, LLC, a business entity

Flack, Terri

Westrock California, LLC, a business entity

Westrock Longview, LLC, a business entity

Westrock CP, LLC, a business entity

Victory Packaging, a business entity

Westrock Services, LLC, a business entity

Victory Packaging, L.P., a business entity

Westrock Packaging Systems, LLC, a business entity

Thiele, Palmer

Westrock MWV, LLC, a business entity

Westrock Converting, LLC, a business entity

Pak, Justyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Beyler, Brett D.

Defendant Attorney

Delanoy, Talia L.

 

Court Documents

civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Westrock Services, LLC, a business entity. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Answer

Defendants Victory Packaging, L.P., Terri flack Justyn Pak and Palmer Thiele's Answer to Plaintiff Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja's complaint and Demand for Jury -------------------------- First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Flack, Terri; Thiele, Palmer; Victory Packaging, L.P., a business entity; Pak, Justyn. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Westrock California, LLC, a business entity. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Victory Packaging, a business entity. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Westrock Converting, LLC, a business entity. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja (Plaintiff); Participant: Justyn Pak (Defendant); Participant: Palmer Thiele (Defendant); Participant: Terri Flack (Defendant); Participant: Victory Packaging, L.P., a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Victory Packaging, a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Westrock CP, LLC, a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Westrock California, LLC, a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Westrock Consumer Packaging Group, LLC, a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Westrock Converting, LLC, a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Westrock Longview, LLC, a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Westrock MWV, LLC, a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Westrock Packaging Systems, LLC, a business entity (Defendant); Participant: Westrock Services, LLC, a business entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendants Victory Packaging, L.P., Terri flack Justyn Pak and Palmer Thiele's Answer to Plaintiff Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja's complaint and Demand for Jury -------------------------- First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Flack, Terri; Thiele, Palmer; Victory Packaging, L.P., a business entity; Pak, Justyn. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Terri Flack in the amount of $1740.00. Receipt number 660591. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Talia L. Delanoy, retained for Victory Packaging, L.P., a business entity . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Talia L. Delanoy, retained for Palmer Thiele . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Talia L. Delanoy, retained for Justyn Pak . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Talia L. Delanoy, retained for Terri Flack . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Westrock California, LLC, a business entity. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Victory Packaging, a business entity. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Westrock Converting, LLC, a business entity. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/05/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 636030. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Brett D. Beyler, retained for Julia Marcela Moran De Ceja . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WestRock California, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Westrock Converting LLC is a litigant