This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 23:25:49 (UTC).

Juan Mares Villegas vs Alondra Aguirre-Mares

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Juan Mares Villegas filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Alondra Aguirre-Mares. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6090

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mares Villegas, Juan

Respondent

Aguirre-Mares, Alondra

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied as to Juan Mares Villegas.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Fee Waiver Hearing; Court Room: 5A; Result: Held; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participants; Juan Mares Villegas (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $435.00, receipt number 795907.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Fee Waiver Hearing held on December 13, 2022.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Fee Waiver Hearing held on 12/13/2022 01:15 PM .; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Hearing Required as to Juan Mares Villegas.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Fee Waiver Hearing Petitioner's fee waiver hearing **$435 fee, set for 12/13/2022 at 1:15 PM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by Mares Villegas, Juan.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Mares Villegas, Juan.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Mares Villegas, Juan.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less