This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:40:13 (UTC).

Juan Heredia vs Kendall Brooke et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Juan Heredia filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Kendall Brooke. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1835

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heredia, Juan

Defendants

Rodriguez, Santiago Alberto

Brooke, Kendall

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Heredia, Juan. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Kendall Brooke and Rodriguez, Santiago Alberto served on 03/15/2016 by Returned Without Satisfaction. $125.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Juan Heredia against Kendall Brooke, Santiago Alberto Rodriguez filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Alberto Rodriguez served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Kendall Brooke, Santiago Alberto Rodriguez Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Heredia, Juan. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Kendall Brooke, Santiago Alberto Rodriguez Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kendall Brooke served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Heredia, Juan. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

03/03/2016: Notice to Filing Party

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Kendall Brooke and Rodriguez, Santiago Alberto served on 03/15/2016 by Returned Without Satisfaction. $125.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Santiago Alberto Rodriguez on 03/10/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Kendall Brooke on 03/10/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Payment received by Juan E. Heredia in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 39317. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Juan Heredia against Kendall Brooke, Santiago Alberto Rodriguez filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Heredia, Juan. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Santiago Alberto Rodriguez served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Kendall Brooke served on 02/24/2016. Type of Service Personal. $0.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Kendall Brooke, Santiago Alberto Rodriguez Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Heredia, Juan. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Kendall Brooke, Santiago Alberto Rodriguez Not Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Heredia, Juan. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Heredia, Juan. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Heredia, Juan. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 33950. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less