This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 14:04:50 (UTC).

Juan Gabriel Franco vs Stockton Livestock Auction Yards et al.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 Juan Gabriel Franco filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Stockton Livestock Auction Yards. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5883

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Franco, Juan Gabriel

Defendants

Stockton Livestock Auction Yards

Stagno, Marie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wroten, Walter Thomas

 

Court Documents

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Juan Gabriel Franco against Stockton Livestock Auction Yards, Marie Stagno in the amount of 25000.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration of Juan Gabriel Franco in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP Section 585 (d) filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 04/05/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS030 Proof of Service By First Class Mail - Civil

Proof of service filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice to Filing Party

03/19/2018: Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party

03/13/2018: Notice to Filing Party

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 08/30/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Marie Stagno served on 11/05/2016 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Stockton Livestock Auction Yards served on 11/02/2016 by Substituted Service. $50.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Juan Gabriel Franco against Stockton Livestock Auction Yards, Marie Stagno in the amount of 25000.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Juan Gabriel Franco in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP Section 585 (d) filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Wade L. Sellers in Support of Application for Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP Section 585 (d) filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/13/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on March 15, 2018. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Stockton Livestock Auction Yards served on 11/02/2016 by Substituted Service. $50.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/14/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Payment received by Juan Franco in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 71422. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Franco, Juan Gabriel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Attorney, Walter Thomas Wroten, Brookman & Wroten retained for Juan Gabriel Franco . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wroten, Walter Thomas