This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:38:42 (UTC).

Juan Dominguez Gama vs Juanita Dominguez

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Juan Dominguez Gama filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Juanita Dominguez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0894

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gama, Juan Dominguez

Respondent

Dominguez, Juanita

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2017
  • Emergency Protective Order filed. Action Type: Emergency Protective Order; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Payment received in the amount of $0.50, receipt number 71454. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Juan Dominguez Gama, Juanita Dominguez Entered. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on April 6, 2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial-Child Custody held on April 6, 2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 04/06/2016 08:15 AM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Juanita Dominguez filed. Served on 02/26/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial-Child Custody , set for 04/06/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO for child custody, visitation, set for 04/06/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department F2. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Gama, Juan Dominguez. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Juan Dominguez Gama filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • RFO-Request for Order filed by Gama, Juan Dominguez. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Gama, Juan Dominguez. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Gama, Juan Dominguez. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less