This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 20:16:54 (UTC).

Juan Carlos Rivera vs Kenia Rivera

Case Summary

On 06/16/2016 Juan Carlos Rivera filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Kenia Rivera. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3351

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rivera, Juan Carlos

Respondent

Rivera, Kenia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Coston, Corrine R

Coston, Corinne R

Respondent Attorney

Medina, Francisco J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address filed by Rivera, Kenia. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Rivera, Kenia. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Rivera, Kenia. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Civil filed by Rivera, Kenia. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail - Civil; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketResponse Domestic Partnership/Marriage filed by Rivera, Kenia. Action Type: Response Domestic Partnership/Marriage; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Francisco Medina in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 204855. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketAttorney, Francisco J Medina, retained for Kenia Rivera . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Default against Kenia Rivera Not Entered Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Rivera, Juan Carlos. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Rivera, Juan Carlos. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Kenia Rivera filed. Served on 06/29/2016. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketPayment received by Corrine Coston in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 71049. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketAttorney, Corrine R Coston, retained for Juan Carlos Rivera . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Rivera, Juan Carlos. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Coston, Corinne R