This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 15:44:36 (UTC).

Joseph Rallo et al. vs Pulte Home Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2019 Joseph Rallo filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Pulte Home Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1024

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bremer, George

Rallo, Joseph

DeLeon, David

Carson, Robert

Lacy, Clifford

Duarte, Gerald

Lacy, Betty

Cardoza Family Living Trust

Larson, Gerold

Kamelle, Alvernette

Perez, Martha

Moore, Sylvia

Wagoner, John

Prioste, Stephanie

Afroilan Living Trust

Miller, William

Murray, Charles

Vincent, Loretta

Cheryl Grady Trust

Defendant

Pulte Home Corporation

104 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jackson, Lee

Plesset, Levi

Defendant Attorney

Phillips, Kory J

Other Attorneys

Hamblin, Lauren A.

Robison, Jessica A

Wallace, Kirstin L.

Seliger, Nicholas S.

Meyer, Raymond Jr.

McElroy, Julie D.

Hammons, Wallace William

Hatem, Robert J

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to James Nessi. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice to Filing Party

08/08/2019: Notice to Filing Party

Answer

Defendant, Pulte Home Company, LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Pulte Home Corporation. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by Pulte Home Company, LLC. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Pulte Home Corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Rallo, Joseph. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rallo, Joseph; Bremer, George. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rallo, Joseph; Bremer, George. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Western Insulation LP. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Association of Counsel

Association of Counsel filed by D & J Plumbing, Inc. Action Type: Association of Counsel; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Order

Pretrial Order No. 3 signed by Judge Kronlund on 02/03/2021 filed by Robert L Friedenberg. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Merillat LP C/O Masco Corporation served on 09/24/2020 by Personal Service. $0.00. as to Pulte Home Cross-Complaint Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to ISI Design and Installation Solutions, Inc. served on 09/02/2020 by Substituted Service. $151.07. as to Pulte Home Cross-Complaint Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to BBR Masonry, Inc. served on 09/07/2020 by Personal Service. $235.75. as to Pulte Home Cross-Complaint Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc. served on 09/04/2020 by Substituted Service. $292.25. as to Pulte Home Cross-Complaint Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Sherman-Loehr Custom Tile Works, Inc.. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer to cross-complaint filed by RCI Electric, Inc., DBA Rayco Electric. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

123 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Afroilan Living Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Participant: Alcal Specialty Contracting, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Alecia Kelley (Plaintiff); Participant: Alvernette Kamelle (Plaintiff); Participant: Angela Holstein Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Anthony Delgado (Plaintiff); Participant: BBR Masonry, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: BC Electric (Cross-Defendant); Participant: BMC West Corporation DBA BMC (Cross-Defendant); Participant: BZ Plumbing Company, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Barbosa Cabinets, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Benchmark Kitchen & Bath Design Studios, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Benedicto Supremo (Plaintiff); Participant: Betty Lacy (Plaintiff); Participant: Beutler Corporation NKA Villara Building Systems (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Beverly Skinner (Plaintiff); Participant: Bill Wilder Construction Company (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Blue Mountain Construction Services (Cross-Defendant); Participant: CVC Construction Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: California Mantel & Fireplace, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Capital City Drywall, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Cardoza Family Living Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Carol Bremer (Plaintiff); Participant: Catherine Gill Living Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Catherine Ray (Plaintiff); Participant: Cecilia Correa (Plaintiff); Participant: Charles Murray (Plaintiff); Participant: Cheryl Grady Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Clifford Lacy (Plaintiff); Participant: Concrete Value Corp (Roe 1) (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Creative Design Interiors, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Cynthia Murray (Plaintiff); Participant: D&J Plumbing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Danee Smith (Plaintiff); Participant: David DeLeon (Plaintiff); Participant: Deborah Moore (Plaintiff); Participant: Dolores Langford (Plaintiff); Participant: Donna Desselle (Plaintiff); Participant: Eleanor Ennis (Plaintiff); Participant: Fenceworks, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Filomena Costa (Plaintiff); Participant: Frances Jeglum (Plaintiff); Participant: George Bremer (Plaintiff); Participant: Gerald Duarte (Plaintiff); Participant: Gerold Larson (Plaintiff); Participant: Goodby Grading, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Hearth & Home Technologies, Inc. DBA Fireside Hearth & Home (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Helen Childress (Plaintiff); Participant: Homesite Services, Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Participant: Homesite Servies, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Hutton Lovewell, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: ISI Design and Installation Solutions, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: J&J Quality Door, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: James Ennis (Plaintiff); Participant: James Fettig (Plaintiff); Participant: James Hackworth (Plaintiff); Participant: James Nessi (Plaintiff); Participant: Jeffery Tilton (Plaintiff); Participant: John Wagoner (Plaintiff); Participant: Joseph Dambra (Plaintiff); Participant: Joseph Rallo (Plaintiff); Participant: Kathi Fotinos (Plaintiff); Participant: Kathleen Hackworth (Plaintiff); Participant: Kenyon Plastering of California, Inc (Cross-Complainant); Participant: Kenyon Plastering, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Kim Hallock (Plaintiff); Participant: Legacy Windows, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Lilibeth Smith (Plaintiff); Participant: Linda Fettig (Plaintiff); Participant: Linda Miller (Plaintiff); Participant: Loretta Vincent (Plaintiff); Participant: Luis Costa (Plaintiff); Participant: Manuel Correa (Plaintiff); Participant: Marilyn Carson (Plaintiff); Participant: Martha Perez (Plaintiff); Participant: Marvin Kelley (Plaintiff); Participant: Melvin Skinner (Plaintiff); Participant: Merillat LP C/O Masco Corporation (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Mid Valley Painting, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Mid Valley Painting, Inc., a dissolved California corporation (Cross-Complainant); Participant: Milgard Manufacturing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Moes 1 through 200 (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Moes 1-200 (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Moes 1-200 (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Moes 1-200 (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Naomi McQueen (Plaintiff); Participant: Patricia Duarte (Plaintiff); Participant: Patricia Voelker (Plaintiff); Participant: Patsy Keskeys Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Patty Willmann (Plaintiff); Participant: Pearson Family Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Pfaffenberger Family Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Preferred Window Products (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Procida Landscape, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Pulte Home Company, LLC (Cross-Complainant); Participant: Pulte Home Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Quality Door & Trim, Inc., DBA Cantrell Construction (Cross-Defendant); Participant: R&A Painting, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: RCI Electric, Inc., DBA Rayco Electric (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Richard Perez (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert Carson (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert Desselle (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert L Friedenberg (Special Master); Participant: Robert McQueen (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert Price (Plaintiff); Participant: Ross Miller (Plaintiff); Participant: Ross Plastering, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Shalice Tilton (Plaintiff); Participant: Shannon Larson (Plaintiff); Participant: Sherburne Family Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Sherman-Loehr Contract Interiors, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Sherman-Loehr Custom Tile Works, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Sonoran Roofing, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Stephanie Prioste (Plaintiff); Participant: Steven McCall (Plaintiff); Participant: Steven Ray (Plaintiff); Participant: Susan Price (Plaintiff); Participant: Sylvia Moore (Plaintiff); Participant: Tamara Supremo (Plaintiff); Participant: Thorpe Design, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Timberlake Cabinetry (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Walldesign, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Western Insulation LP (Cross-Defendant); Participant: William Miller (Plaintiff); Participant: William Prioste (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Afroilan Living Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Alecia Kelley (Plaintiff); Participant: Alvernette Kamelle (Plaintiff); Participant: Angela Holstein Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Anthony Delgado (Plaintiff); Participant: Benchmark Kitchen & Bath Design Studios, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Benedicto Supremo (Plaintiff); Participant: Betty Lacy (Plaintiff); Participant: Beutler Corporation NKA Villara Building Systems (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Beverly Skinner (Plaintiff); Participant: Cardoza Family Living Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Carol Bremer (Plaintiff); Participant: Catherine Gill Living Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Catherine Ray (Plaintiff); Participant: Cecilia Correa (Plaintiff); Participant: Charles Murray (Plaintiff); Participant: Cheryl Grady Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Clifford Lacy (Plaintiff); Participant: Cynthia Murray (Plaintiff); Participant: Danee Smith (Plaintiff); Participant: David DeLeon (Plaintiff); Participant: Deborah Moore (Plaintiff); Participant: Dolores Langford (Plaintiff); Participant: Donna Desselle (Plaintiff); Participant: Eleanor Ennis (Plaintiff); Participant: Filomena Costa (Plaintiff); Participant: Frances Jeglum (Plaintiff); Participant: George Bremer (Plaintiff); Participant: Gerald Duarte (Plaintiff); Participant: Gerold Larson (Plaintiff); Participant: Hearth & Home Technologies, Inc. DBA Fireside Hearth & Home (Cross-Defendant); Participant: Helen Childress (Plaintiff); Participant: James Ennis (Plaintiff); Participant: James Fettig (Plaintiff); Participant: James Hackworth (Plaintiff); Participant: James Nessi (Plaintiff); Participant: Jeffery Tilton (Plaintiff); Participant: John Wagoner (Plaintiff); Participant: Joseph Dambra (Plaintiff); Participant: Joseph Rallo (Plaintiff); Participant: Kathi Fotinos (Plaintiff); Participant: Kathleen Hackworth (Plaintiff); Participant: Kim Hallock (Plaintiff); Participant: Lilibeth Smith (Plaintiff); Participant: Linda Fettig (Plaintiff); Participant: Linda Miller (Plaintiff); Participant: Loretta Vincent (Plaintiff); Participant: Luis Costa (Plaintiff); Participant: Manuel Correa (Plaintiff); Participant: Marilyn Carson (Plaintiff); Participant: Martha Perez (Plaintiff); Participant: Marvin Kelley (Plaintiff); Participant: Melvin Skinner (Plaintiff); Participant: Mid Valley Painting, Inc., a dissolved California corporation (Cross-Complainant); Participant: Naomi McQueen (Plaintiff); Participant: Patricia Duarte (Plaintiff); Participant: Patricia Voelker (Plaintiff); Participant: Patsy Keskeys Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Patty Willmann (Plaintiff); Participant: Pearson Family Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Pfaffenberger Family Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Pulte Home Corporation (Defendant); Participant: Richard Perez (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert Carson (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert Desselle (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert L Friedenberg (Special Master); Participant: Robert McQueen (Plaintiff); Participant: Robert Price (Plaintiff); Participant: Ross Miller (Plaintiff); Participant: Shalice Tilton (Plaintiff); Participant: Shannon Larson (Plaintiff); Participant: Sherburne Family Trust (Plaintiff); Participant: Stephanie Prioste (Plaintiff); Participant: Steven McCall (Plaintiff); Participant: Steven Ray (Plaintiff); Participant: Susan Price (Plaintiff); Participant: Sylvia Moore (Plaintiff); Participant: Tamara Supremo (Plaintiff); Participant: William Miller (Plaintiff); Participant: William Prioste (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Pulte Home Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Western Insulation LP. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Pulte Home Company, LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference per TMO #6, set for 10/20/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by D&J Plumbing, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by R&A Painting, Inc.; Homesite Servies, Inc.; Beutler Corporation NKA Villara Building Systems; J&J Quality Door, Inc.; Mid Valley Painting, Inc.; Kenyon Plastering, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Without Prejudice NOT ENTERED filed by Pulte Home Company, LLC. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
328 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Charles Murray . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Deborah Moore . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Sylvia Moore . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Linda Miller . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for William Miller . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Ross Miller . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Shannon Larson . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Gerold Larson . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Betty Lacy . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Lee Jackson, retained for Clifford Lacy . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pulte Home Company, LLC, successor by conversion of Pulte Home Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLACE, KIRSTON L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hamblin, Lauren A