Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 22:20:38 (UTC).

Joseph Ornelas vs Yolanda Duenez et al.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2016 Joseph Ornelas filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Yolanda Duenez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eagle, Kristine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1010

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eagle, Kristine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ornelas, Joseph

Defendants

Duenez, Jose

Duenez, Yolanda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Joseph Ornelas against Yolanda Duenez, Jose Duenez in the amount of $2733.46 Signed by Judge Eagle Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Joseph Ornelas against Yolanda Duenez, Jose Duenez filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Yolanda Duenez, Jose Duenez Entered Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Service date 11/08/16, fees $55.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jose Duenez served on 11/08/2016 by Post & Mail. $55.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Yolanda Duenez served on 11/08/2016 by Post & Mail. $55.00. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Order to Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Joseph Ornelas against Yolanda Duenez, Jose Duenez in the amount of $2733.46 Signed by Judge Eagle Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Jose Duenez on 11/30/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Yolanda Duenez on 11/30/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • Payment received by Bruce Doerksen in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 123208. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Joseph Ornelas against Yolanda Duenez, Jose Duenez filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Yolanda Duenez, Jose Duenez Entered Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Payment received by Bruce Doerksen in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 117565. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Attorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Joseph Ornelas . Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ornelas, Joseph. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • Payment received by Bruce Doerksen in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 115677. Judge: Eagle, Kristine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowe, Anthony Drew