This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/24/2019 at 01:10:20 (UTC).

Joseph Kraft vs. Beck Properties, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2014 Joseph Kraft filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Beck Properties, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1062

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Taylor, William

Vinyard, Brenda

Joseph Kraft

Miscellaneous Participant 11

Luis, Jose

Mendoza, Catalina

Miscellaneous Participant 3,

Sanchez, Jose Luis

Defendant

Beck Properties, Inc.

Cross Plaintiff

Mill Outlets Inc.

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

Crivello Painting & Decorating

Miscellaneous Participant 54

Miscellaneous Participant 11

Miscellaneous Participant 43

T&C Roofing

Brantley Masonry

Miscellaneous Participant 60

Miscellaneous Participant 24

Cantrell Construction, Inc.

Miscellaneous Participant 3,

Miscellaneous Participant 57

Kenyon Plastering, Inc.

60 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blye, Anneke J.

Defendant Attorney

Moore, Alexander R

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Blaisdell, Benjamin W

Other Attorneys

McKenna, J. Justin

Rapp, Susan H.

Hazelton, Troy M.

Kraft, Philip A

Lockhart, Robert D.

Burek, Lawrence M.

Ching, Catharine Ann

 

Court Documents

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Beck Properties, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Participant entered as to David Hall Masonry, Inc.. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service on Summons returned unserved as to Brett James Wall filed by Gilwin Company. (No physical description given for "Jane Doe" and Due Diligence is missing) Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Non Service Report

Non Service Report filed by Gilwin Company. Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Black Diamond Electric, Inc.. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Gilwin Company does not consent to Case Management Order No. 2

Gilwin Company does not consent to Case Management Order No. 2 filed by Gilwin Company. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against T&C Roofing Entered Judge: Ross, Roger.

Case Management Order No. 3

08/26/2015: Case Management Order No. 3

Second Amended Complaint

08/26/2015: Second Amended Complaint

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Beck Properties, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order

Order Granting Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement entered as to Cross-Defendants, Mill Outlets, Inc. dba Joe Lents Abbey Carpets & Floors. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address filed by Beck Properties, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Beck Properties, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Application to the Special Master for an Order Allowing Service of Summons on Brett James Wall, Individually and DBA Wall to Wall Glass by Publication filed by Gilwin Company. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by David Hall Masonry, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice

Notice of Case Management Order NO. 6 filed by Najarian, Jube J.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

08/26/2015: SUM100 Summons - Civil

Payment Receipt

06/23/2014: Payment Receipt

232 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by T&C Roofing. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to T&C Roofing Not Entered. Case disposed Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Request for Dismissal filed by T&C Roofing. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 04/27/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal re Dismissal as to Cross-Complaint filed by Beck Properties, set for 06/01/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Request for Dismissal held on April 27, 2018. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Beck Properties, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Beck Properties, Inc.. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
501 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2014
  • Status of Linda Ellsworth updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Beck Homes Inc., a California corp. added as a Defendant effective 02/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Beck Properties Inc., a California corp. added as a Defendant effective 02/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Vinyard, Brenda added as a Plaintiff effective 02/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 07/07/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Ross, Roger. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Original Summons filed by Kraft, Joseph on 02/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kraft, Joseph on 02/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • Complaint filed by Kraft, Joseph on 02/03/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beck Properties Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Brantley Masonry is a litigant

Latest cases where CANTRELL CONSTRUCTION, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where T & C ROOFING, INC. is a litigant