This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/13/2019 at 07:57:50 (UTC).

Joseph A. Rios Jr. et al. vs Woodside O5N, LP, a California limited partnership et al.

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 Joseph A Rios Jr filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Woodside O5N, LP, a California limited partnership. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Humphreys, Elizabeth and Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9559

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Humphreys, Elizabeth

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Latona, Loree

Sill, Carmen H.

Bibaoco, Amor

Weatherbie, Danielle

Sutherland, April

Sutherland, Aaron

Hodge, Deborah

Vitug, Mary E.

Bibaoco, Alfredo

Rios, Olivia

Hodge, Larry

Sill, Gregory E.

Hawkinson, Graham Thomas

Rios Jr., Joseph A.

Bitg, Emanuel M.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Woodside O5N, LP, a California limited partnership

Woodside 06N, LP, a California limited partnership

Woodside 07N, LP, a California limited partnership

A California corporatopm

Woodside Homes of California, Inc

51 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LoCoco, Antonina C.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, Daniel J.

Other Attorneys

Milionis, George K.

Haskins, Keith A.

Heller, Elliot H.

Cano, Gino

Bacon, Jonathan C.

Meyer, Raymond Jr.

McElroy, Julie D.

Walsh, Paul Bradley

Cox, Chip

Laskin, Tamara Ann

Borges, Guy D.

Hotchkin, August

Bell, Jacob D.

Truong, Adam V.

Printz, Matthew H

Silva, Dirk E

 

Court Documents

Declaration

Declaration of Daniel J. Smith in Support of Woodside Homes of California, Inc. and Woodside 05N, L.P.'s Motion to Serve Summons on Cross-Complaint and Cross-Complaint by Delivery to Secretary of State filed by Najarian, Jube J. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Intent to Appear by Phone for Trial Setting Conference

Notice of Intent to Appear by Phone for Trial setting Conference filed by Blue Mountain Construction Services. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Association of Counsel

Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Far West Windows, Inc.. Action Type: Association of Counsel; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to West-Cal Concrete, Inc. served on 02/21/2018 by Substituted Service. . Cross Complaint filed 2/1/18 Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice

Notice of disassociation of counsel filed by Kenyon Plastering of Stockton; Kenyon Plastering, Inc.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice of Appearance

TDH Construction, Inc., dba Foothill Painting & Drywall Notice of Appearance filed by Foothill Painting & Drywall, Inc.. (Answered as TDH Construction, Inc. for named defendant Foothill Painting & Drywall) Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice to Filing Party

07/18/2019: Notice to Filing Party

Answer

Answer to Cross-Complaint filed by IStairs, Inc. erroneously sued as I Stair, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Petersen-Dean, Inc. served on 02/16/2018 by Substituted Service. . Cross Complaint filed 2/1/18- No Agent for Service listed Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 02/11/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Hearing Result: Jury Trial Vacated Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Hearing Result: MSC Vacated Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Case status updated to Conditional Settlement. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Rios Jr., Joseph A. et al. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Motion for Entry of Judgment , set for 11/06/2019 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service filed by Rios Jr., Joseph A. et al.. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Clinton L. Smith in Support of Motion for Entry of Judgment filed by Rios Jr., Joseph A. et al.. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Entry of Judgment filed by Rios Jr., Joseph A. et al.. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion for Entry of Judgment filed by Rios Jr., Joseph A. et al.. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
186 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rios, Olivia; Latona, Loree; Rios Jr., Joseph A.; Vitug, Mary E.; Sill, Gregory E.; Bibaoco, Alfredo; Sutherland, Aaron; Sutherland, April; Hodge, Larry; Bitg, Emanuel M.; Hawkinson, Graham Thomas; Sill, Carmen H.; Hodge, Deborah; Bibaoco, Amor; Weatherbie, Danielle. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Attorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Molly Abraham . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Attorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Danielle Weatherbie . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Attorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Mary E. Vitug . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Attorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Emanuel M. Vitug . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Attorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for April Sutherland . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Attorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Aaron Sutherland . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Attorney, Antonina C. LoCoco, retained for Gregory E. Sill . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Payment received by Joseph Rios Jr. in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 208179. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Woodside Homes of California, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laskin, Tamara Ann

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bell, Jacob Douglas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HELLER, ELLIOT H