This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:37:34 (UTC).

Josefina Terriquez vs Marcelino Terriquez Figueroa

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Josefina Terriquez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Marcelino Terriquez Figueroa. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0885

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Terriquez, Josefina

Respondents

Figueroa, Terriquez Marcelino

Terriquez Figueroa, Marcelino

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • Ex Parte Application for Earnings Assignment Order filed by Terriquez Figueroa, Marcelino. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Earnings Assignment Order; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Income Withholding for Support entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $7.00, receipt number 292681. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $4.50, receipt number 291460. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Declaration of Payment History filed by Terriquez Figueroa, Marcelino. Action Type: Declaration of Payment History; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Ex Parte Application for Earnings Assignment Order filed by Terriquez Figueroa, Marcelino. Action Type: Ex Parte Application for Earnings Assignment Order; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Income Withholding for Support entered and filed. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Marcelino Terriquez Figueroa Granted. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on November 22, 2017. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 11/22/2017 08:15 AM . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Figueroa, Terriquez Marcelino. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Terriquez, Josefina. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Terriquez, Josefina. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Terriquez Marcelino Figueroa filed. Served on 03/04/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Josefina Terriquez . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34209. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Terriquez, Josefina . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Terriquez, Josefina. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less