This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/14/2020 at 05:58:05 (UTC).

Jose Rodriguez vs Saturnino Plascencia Gallardo

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Jose Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Saturnino Plascencia Gallardo. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2297

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Jose

Defendant

Gallardo, Saturnino Plascencia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Platt, Daniel T.

Defendant Attorney

Foster, Luke A.

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer to complaint filed by Gallardo, Saturnino Plascencia. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Jose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Saturnino Plascencia Gallardo served on 09/27/2019 by Substituted Service. $90.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rodriguez, Jose. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to complaint filed by Gallardo, Saturnino Plascencia. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Payment received by Saturnino Gallardo in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 490712. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Attorney, Luke A. Foster, retained for Saturnino Plascencia Gallardo . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Saturnino Plascencia Gallardo served on 09/27/2019 by Substituted Service. $90.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/16/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rodriguez, Jose. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rodriguez, Jose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Payment received by Jose Rodriguez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 474314. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Attorney, Daniel T. Platt, retained for Jose Rodriguez . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.