This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:03:23 (UTC).

Jose Manuel Santiago, Jr vs Van Groningen & Sons, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Jose Manuel Santiago, Jr filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Van Groningen Sons, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1869

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel

Defendants

Becerra, Roberto Gonzalez

Van Groningen & Sons, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lucas, Spencer R.

Defendant Attorney

Bates, Mark A

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Summons filed by Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Van Groningen & Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Association of Counsel

Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Van Groningen & Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/26/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Sueyres, F. Clark.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Roberto Gonzalez Becerra served on 03/08/2017 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Trial and all Related Cut-Off Dates entered and filed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 02/26/2018 03:00 PM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS10 Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Van Groningen & Sons, Inc. served on 03/15/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jose Manuel Santiago, Jr, Van Groningen & Sons, Inc., Roberto Gonzalez Becerra Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer to Complaint by Defendant Van Groningen & Sons, Inc. filed by Van Groningen & Sons, Inc.. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Case Management Order

Case Management Statement filed by Van Groningen & Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice to Filing Party

03/06/2018: Notice to Filing Party

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 12/20/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Van Groningen & Sons, Inc.. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Jose Manuel Santiago, Jr, Van Groningen & Sons, Inc., Roberto Gonzalez Becerra Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Mandatory Settlement Conference held on 02/26/2018 03:00 PM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 02/26/2018 at 3:00 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment, set for 03/12/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2016
  • Attorney, Mark A Bates, retained for Van Groningen & Sons, Inc. . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Van Groningen & Sons, Inc. served on 03/15/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/26/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34162. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Santiago, Jr, Jose Manuel. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Spencer R. Lucas, retained for Jose Manuel Santiago, Jr . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less