This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 13:29:59 (UTC).

Jose Luis Mendoza vs Laura Leticia Mendoza

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 Jose Luis Mendoza filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Laura Leticia Mendoza. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0516

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mendoza, Jose Luis

Respondent

Mendoza, Laura Leticia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Hearing re: Default Dissolution held on March 5, 2018. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Default Dissolution held on 03/05/2018 01:30 PM . Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Default Dissolution , set for 03/05/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4B. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing filed by Mendoza, Jose Luis. Action Type: Request to Set Default or Uncontested Matter for Hearing; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Laura Leticia Mendoza filed. Served on 02/08/2017. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Mendoza, Jose Luis. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Mendoza, Jose Luis. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Request for Default against Laura Leticia Mendoza Entered Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Mendoza, Jose Luis. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Mendoza, Jose Luis. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Payment received by Jose Mendoza in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 138717. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Mendoza, Jose Luis. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less