This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 08:46:32 (UTC).

Jose Hugo Mendoza Rodriguez et al. vs City of Lodi et al.

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Jose Hugo Mendoza Rodriguez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Lodi. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4455

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mendoza Ceja, Melissa

Mendoza Ceja, Christian

Mendoza Rodriguez, Jose Hugo

Defendants

City of Lodi

County of San Joaquin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Booker, Robert L. II

Defendant Attorney

Belaga, Jonathan J

 

Court Documents

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Demand for Jury Trial; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to California Department of Transportation. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

proof of service

Proof of Service of Summons as to City of Lodi served on 08/04/2020 by Personal Service. $220.60. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Firm name and electronic Mail addresses filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mendoza Rodriguez, Jose Hugo; Mendoza Ceja, Melissa; Mendoza Ceja, Christian. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Mendoza Ceja, Melissa; Mendoza Rodriguez, Jose Hugo; Mendoza Ceja, Christian. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV120 Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by California Department of Transportation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: California Department of Transportation (Defendant); Participant: Christian Mendoza Ceja (Plaintiff); Participant: City of Lodi (Defendant); Participant: County of San Joaquin (Defendant); Participant: Jose Hugo Mendoza Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Participant: Melissa Mendoza Ceja (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Mendoza Ceja, Christian; Mendoza Rodriguez, Jose Hugo; Mendoza Ceja, Melissa. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against City of Lodi Not Entered Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Mendoza Ceja, Melissa; Mendoza Rodriguez, Jose Hugo; Mendoza Ceja, Christian. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by California Department of Transportation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm name and electronic Mail addresses filed by County of San Joaquin. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Reset - Court's Motion; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: California Department of Transportation (Defendant); Participant: Christian Mendoza Ceja (Plaintiff); Participant: City of Lodi (Defendant); Participant: County of San Joaquin (Defendant); Participant: Jose Hugo Mendoza Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Participant: Melissa Mendoza Ceja (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Continuing Case Management Conference filed Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/22/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/25/2020 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Jose Mendoza Rodriguez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 562445. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Robert L. Booker II, retained for Christian Mendoza Ceja . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Robert L. Booker II, retained for Melissa Mendoza Ceja . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Robert L. Booker II, retained for Jose Hugo Mendoza Rodriguez . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mendoza Ceja, Christian; Mendoza Ceja, Melissa; Mendoza Rodriguez, Jose Hugo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mendoza Ceja, Christian; Mendoza Ceja, Melissa; Mendoza Rodriguez, Jose Hugo. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less